Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:07:07 (UTC).

OAKRIDGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS MONTALVO

Case Summary

On 07/13/2015 OAKRIDGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MONTALVO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Lampe, David R. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0433

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Lampe, David R.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OAKRIDGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

MONTALVO, MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAZE, JAMES J

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Minute Order-Case Management Conference - 1/11/16: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Further Case Management Conference

4/11/16 MO: Further Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT'D FROM 01/11/16

Further Case Management Conference

05/11/16 MO: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 01/11/16; 04/11/16

Debtor's Examination

Debtor's Examination 09/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: as to MARIA MONTALVO

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: OAKRIDGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION; Awarded Against: MONTALVO, MARIA; Amount; Damages: $4,405.00; Pre-Judgment Interest: $888.00; Attorney Fees: $1,616.50; Costs: $484.08; Total: $7393.58; Party: Names: OAKRIDGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION; MONTALVO, MARIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Debtor's Examination - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Letter Received - Comment: Letter From: Gail Stimmell Date of Letter: 11/29/2017 Re: Removing OEX from calendar.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Notice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Ruling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: as to MARIA MONTALVO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: as to MARIA MONTALVO Hearing Date: 11/20/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Debtor's Examination - Debtor's Examination 09/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: as to MARIA MONTALVO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: as to MARIA MONTALVO Hearing Date: 9/19/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: VIJ RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2016
  • Case Management Statement - Comment: Filed by James J Braze

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Minute Order-Case Management Conference - 1/11/16: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Case Management Statement - Comment: Filed by James J. Braze, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: as to Maria Montalvo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Maria Montalvo sub served 8/6/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/27/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less