Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 05:13:56 (UTC).

OAK TREE AFFILIATES, INC. VS TEHACHAPI-CUMMINGS COUNTY

Case Summary

On 01/09/2013 OAK TREE AFFILIATES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TEHACHAPI-CUMMINGS COUNTY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Lampe, David R. and Wyatt, Ralph Wm.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8442

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Lampe, David R.

Wyatt, Ralph Wm.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OAK TREE AFFILIATES, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

OAK TREE AFFILIATES, INC.

Defendants

TEHACHAPI - CUMMINGS COUNTY WATER DISTRICT, A COUNTY WATER DISTRICT ORGANIZED AND EXISTING BY VIRTUE

TEHACHAPI-CUMMINGS COUNTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STACEY, SHERMAN L

Attorney at GAINES & STACEY

1111 Bayside Dr #280

Corona Del Mar, CA 92625

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2015
  • Docket4003 Order to Show Cause - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385CONTINUED FROM 7/11/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385CONTINUED FROM 7/11/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: CROSS-COMPLAINT TEHACHAPI-CUMMINGS COUNTY WATER DISTRICT DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. FILED BY BERNARD C. BARMANN, JR., ESQ. ENDORSED COPY RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketNP1511 - Comment: Department: 11 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. HEARING BEFORE TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: TEHACHAPI-CUMMINGS COUNTY WATER DISTRICT, A COUNTY WATER DISTRICT ORGANIZED AND EXISTING BY VIRTUE OF THE PROVISIONS OF (CC-1) APPEARS BY BERNARD CHARLES BARMANN. *************************************************************************************** CAUSE IS CONTINUED TO 11/13/2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DIV/DEPT 11 FOR HEARING ON CAL: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE BEFORE THE HON. DAVID R LAMPE OR OTHER ASSIGNED JUDICIAL OFFICER. REASON FOR NEXT APPEARANCE: AT THE REQUEST OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARTION OF MAILING THIS DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Docket4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Original Type: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketNotice - Comment: OF INABILITY TO DISMISS CROSS-COMPLAINT BY DATE SPECIFIED IN COURT'S MINUTE ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DATED 5/27/14; DEC. OF BERNARD C. BARMANN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • DocketCourt Trial - Original Type: Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS CONT FROM 4/1/14 TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS CONT FROM 4/1/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • Docket839 Pmt: Fax Filing Fees CRC 2006 - Comment: Amount of $3.00 for OAK TREE AFFILIATES, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT... (PL-1). Received from OAK TREE. Receipt #781919 for amount of $3.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: DEFENDANT HAS BEEN SERVED ~ calid=2132942 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4159, CourtDate:04/24/2013, Courtroom:4, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:SPC, Deputy:teresag, SystemDate:1/9/2013 3:12:42 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint - Comment: FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Comment: TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT GRANTED UP AND TO 4/15/2013. **JUDGE SIDNEY P. CHAPIN**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • Docket801N First Appearance Unlimited Civil GC 70612 8/6/12 - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for TEHACHAPI-CUMMINGS COUNTY WATER DISTRICT, A COU... (DE-1). Received from KUHS, check no(s) 10907. Receipt #710498 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for OAK TREE AFFILIATES, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT... (PL-1). Received from SHERMAN L. STACEY, check no(s) 2756. Receipt #696297 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY SHERMAN L. STACEY/ CASE MANAGEMENT 7/8/13 800 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 24, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 24, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: CONTRACT 06

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STACEY SHERMAN L.