This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2023 at 07:16:01 (UTC).

O. VS KERN COUNTY SUPERINTENDENT OF SCHOOLS ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 O filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KERN COUNTY SUPERINTENDENT OF SCHOOLS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2948

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

O., G.

Defendants

KERN COUNTY SUPERINTENDENT OF SCHOOLS

PEREZ, NEFTALI

DEAN, KEISHA

Guardian Ad Litem

OLDREAD, JENNIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

KELLAR MICHAEL C

 

Court Documents

Amended Answer

09/12/2022: Amended Answer

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

08/08/2022: Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

Stipulation and Order

08/03/2022: Stipulation and Order

Further Case Management Conference

07/05/2022: Further Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference

06/20/2022: Case Management Conference

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

06/03/2022: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

06/03/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

06/01/2022: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

06/01/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

02/17/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

02/17/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Answer to Complaint

02/23/2022: Answer to Complaint

Electronic Rejection Notice

02/17/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

01/06/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Order to Show Cause

12/20/2021: Order to Show Cause

Summons Issued and Filed

12/20/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

12/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Complaint

12/20/2021: Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Dept.: Bakersfield Division H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Final Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Amended Answer; Comment: First Amended Answer to Complaint (Answers); Filed By: DEFENDANT - DEAN, KEISHA|DEFENDANT - KERN COUNTY SUPERINTENDENT OF SCHOOLS|DEFENDANT - PEREZ, NEFTALI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf; Comment: Time estimate: 7-10 daysThe above entitled matter is set for Mandatory Settlement Conference on April 28, 2023 at 11:00 AMin Division J.The above entitled matter is set for Final Case Management Conference on May 22, 2023 at 9:00 AMin Division H before the Honorable Bernard C. Barmann, Jr. (see pretrial rules on the next page).The above entitled matter is set for Trial on May 22, 2023 at 9:00 AM in Division H before the HonorableBernard C. Barmann, Jr..Your attention is directed to the attached special rules relating to settlement conferences and the California Rulesof Court, Rule 3.1380.Duty of the attorneys as to settlement conference: Except as otherwise directed by the Court for good cause shown, allparties, their attorneys and, when a party is insured, a representative of the insurance company who has the authority tosettle such case, shall attend the settlement conference.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Stipulation and Order; Comment: of Court Granting Defendants Leave to File First Amended Answer to Complaint GOOD CAUSE having been shown therefor, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants KERN COUNTY SUPERINTENDENT OF SCHOOLS, NEFTALI PEREZ, and KEISHA DEAN DISTRICT are granted leave to file their First Amended Answer To Complaint.; Filed By: DEFENDANT - DEAN, KEISHA|DEFENDANT - KERN COUNTY SUPERINTENDENT OF SCHOOLS|DEFENDANT - PEREZ, NEFTALI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division H; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division H; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - O., G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - O., G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - DEAN, KEISHA|DEFENDANT - KERN COUNTY SUPERINTENDENT OF SCHOOLS|DEFENDANT - PEREZ, NEFTALI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Transportation Supervisor Neftali Perez, via electronic service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - O., G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Bus Driver Keisha Dean, via electronic service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - O., G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: re; Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Kern County Superintendent of Schools, as to sub service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - O., G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 04/04/2022Hearing Time: 8:30 amHearing Department/Division: H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil); Comment: Appointing Jennifer Oldread as Guardian Ad Litem of G.O., a minor; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - O., G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - O., G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - O., G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - O., G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less