This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:57:02 (UTC).

NY VS MCCANTS

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 NY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MCCANTS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0921

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NY, TOM

Defendant

MCCANTS, KIMBERLY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: NY, TOM; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 408 CRYSTAL ST, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93308; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: MCCANTS, KIMBERLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer(s): Etienne, Linda S., Copelan, James B.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: Returned via Effective.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: As to Kimberly McCants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Kimberly McCants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to All unknown occupants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: NY, TOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 408 CRYSTAL ST BAKERSFIELD, CA 93308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less