This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 16:39:57 (UTC).

Nuvision Federal Credit Union VS Valadez

Case Summary

On 09/05/2017 Nuvision Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Valadez. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Palmer, William D., Shayer, Steven, Camacho, Marcos R. and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0243

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Palmer, William D.

Shayer, Steven

Camacho, Marcos R.

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nuvision Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Valadez, Jose

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANAYA, ALANA B

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Absrtract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Nuvision Federal Credit Union; Awarded Against: Valadez, Jose; Amount; Damages: $14,388.59; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $2,408.28; Costs: $444.50; Other: $0.00; Total: $17241.37; Party: Names: Nuvision Federal Credit Union; Valadez, Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF BARRY VISLOCKY IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT [CCP 585D]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF ALANA B. ANAYA RE: ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: DOES 1 TO 50 WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketRequest for Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: JOSE VALADEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Hearing Date: 12/01/2017 Hearing Time: 9:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: Nuvision Federal Credit Union; Served: 09/11/201711:24 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less