This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:36:20 (UTC).

NUNO VS NUNO

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 NUNO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NUNO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0354

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NUNO, PHILIP D.

Respondent

NUNO, JENNIFER M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCHARDT, ELKE GORDON

Respondent Attorneys

HERNANDEZ, DANIEL

CLARK, SUSAN E L

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 04/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: NUNO, PHILIP D.; Attorney: SCHARDT, ELKE GORDON; Respondent: NUNO, JENNIFER M.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketAppearance Stipulation and Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketStipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Mandatory Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketAt Issue Court Trial < 1 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: DANIEL HERNANDEZ New Attorney: PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less