This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 23:51:51 (UTC).

NUNEZ VS NUNEZ (D)

Case Summary

On 05/12/2016 NUNEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NUNEZ D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Benavides, Jose R., Stainfield, Bryan K., Canaday, Jim R, McKnight, Ralph L., Jr., Gill, Susan M., Louie, Chad A., Bittleston, Dawn and Camacho, Marcos R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2649

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Benavides, Jose R.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Canaday, Jim R

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

Gill, Susan M.

Louie, Chad A.

Bittleston, Dawn

Camacho, Marcos R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NUNEZ, CANDELARIA

Respondent

NUNEZ, LEONARDO A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEON, DAVID F

Respondent Attorneys

GORSKI, VINCENT A

GORSKI, VINCENT A.

 

Court Documents

Long Cause Hearing

Long Cause Hearing 03/12/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: AS TO C/S, S/S, PROPERTY CONTROL

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

01/16/2018 MO: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE/REQUEST FOR ORDER -RESPONDENT: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 04/29/16 PET TRO C/C C/V C/S AM CLASSES/PARENTING CLASSES CONT'D FROM 11/16 *11; Parties Present Petitioner: NUNEZ, CANDELARIA; Attorney: LEON, DAVID F; Respondent: NUNEZ, LEONARDO A; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

11/16/2017 MO: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE/REQUEST FOR ORDER-RESPONDENT: Judicial Officer: Canaday, Jim R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 04/29/16 PET TRO C/C C/V C/S AM CLASSES/PARENTING CLASSES CONT'D FROM 9/7 AND 11/09; Parties Present Petitioner: NUNEZ, CANDELARIA; Attorney: LEON, DAVID F; Respondent: NUNEZ, LEONARDO A; Attorney: GORSKI, VINCENT A

Request for Order - Respondent

11/09/2017 MO: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE/REQUEST FOR ORDER -RESPONDENT: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 02/23/17 RES DV ORDER STAY AWAY CONT FROM 09/07; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: LEON, DAVID F

Request for Order - Respondent

09/07/2017 MO: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE/REQUEST FOR ORDER - RESPONDENT: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 02/23/17 RES DV ORDER STAY AWAY CONT FROM 05/25 AND 07/06; Parties Present Petitioner: NUNEZ, CANDELARIA; Attorney: LEON, DAVID F; Respondent: NUNEZ, LEONARDO A

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

07/06/2017 MO: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE/REQUEST FOR ORDER - RESPONDENT: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 4/29/16 PET DV TRO C/C C/V C/S ANGER MGNT/PARENTING CLASSES 3 MINORS CONT FROM 05/25; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: LEON, DAVID F; Respondent: NUNEZ, LEONARDO A

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: CORRECTION AS TO CONSOLIDATED LEAD CASE

Motion to Consolidate

Motion to Consolidate 08/18/2016: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: NUNEZ, CANDELARIA; Attorney: LEON, DAVID F; Respondent: NUNEZ, LEONARDO A

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw 12/02/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions Held; Comment: 11/18/19 RES NOM TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 10/23/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT FROM 10/22/19

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 10/22/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 06/19/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CASE STATUS CONFERENCE C/S S/S PROP CNTRL STATUS OF SALE OF PROP

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 02/05/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CASE STATUS CONFERENCE CONT FROM 11/28, 1/29/19 - RE: RESET EVID HRG. *2

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 01/29/2019: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CASE STATUS CONFERENCE CONT FROM 11/28 - RE: RESET EVID HRG.

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 11/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 9/21/18 PET C/S S/S PROP CNTRL

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 04/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 04/29/16 PET TRO C/C C/V C/S AM CLASSES/PARENTING CLASSES CONT'D FROM 11/16 AND 01/16/18 *12

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: FOAH RET'D TO ATTY BIN

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Comment: E-RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Comment: HRG 12/02/2019 Signed Pursuant to C.C.P.635

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw 12/02/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: 10/23/19 PET APPT COURT CLERK AS ELISOR TO SIGN PROPERTY SALE DOCUMENTS/SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to be Relieved / Withdraw - Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw 12/02/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions Held; Comment: 11/18/19 RES NOM TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: E-FILED: Notice of Motion to be relieved as counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: HRG 12/02/19 D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketTemporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305) - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Comment: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300) - Comment: HRG 12/2/19 DIV D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Ex Parte Hearing 10/23/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT FROM 10/22/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketMotion to be Relieved / Withdraw - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 9/4/19 RES NOM TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL *SERVICE ISSUES*

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketAmended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DocketDCSS: (Default)Judgment re Parental Obligations-Supplemental - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Comment: 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default - Comment: DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Consolidate - Motion to Consolidate 08/18/2016: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • DocketSummons & Supplemental Complaint (DCSS) - Comment: 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less