This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:45:43 (UTC).

NUNEZ VS LUNA(B)

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 NUNEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LUNA B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Loo, Cynthia L. and Fielder, John L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4602

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Loo, Cynthia L.

Fielder, John L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NUNEZ, LOURDES

Respondent

LUNA, EDDIE JOHN

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 06/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 05/31/17 RES ADD MINOR DNA TESTING NO SERVICE

Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees

Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees 03/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW (RECONSIDERATION) FEES: $435.00; Parties Present Petitioner: NUNEZ, LOURDES

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 06/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 05/31/17 RES ADD MINOR DNA TESTING NO SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: HRG 6/28/2017 DIV E RES-ADD MINOR, DNA TESTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Revenue Recovery Document-Agreement to Satisfy Court - Comment: Ordered Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 4/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Order on Fee Waiver After Reconsideration - Ended - 10 Days - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: ARRANGEMENT TOTAL DUE $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees - Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees 03/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW (RECONSIDERATION) FEES: $435.00; Parties Present Petitioner: NUNEZ, LOURDES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Notice To Appear For Reconsideration Of Fee Waiver (FW-011) - Comment: HRG 3/3/17 DIV C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less