This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 20:58:59 (UTC).

NUNEZ VS CARTER

Case Summary

On 04/04/2016 NUNEZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CARTER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0090

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NUNEZ, LEONARDO

Defendant

CARTER, TAMMY

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

06/17/16 MO: Order to show cause- 3.15.1(C): Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: NUNEZ, LEONARDO

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

**MO - Continuance: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff: NUNEZ, LEONARDO; Defendant: CARTER, TAMMY

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: NUNEZ, LEONARDO; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: CARTER, TAMMY; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $1,600.00; Holdover Damages: $1,039.00; Total: $2,639.00; Party: Names: NUNEZ, LEONARDO; CARTER, TAMMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - 06/17/16 MO: Order to show cause- 3.15.1(C): Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - **MO - Continuance: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: All unknown occupants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: Tammy Carter (DE-1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • DocketNotice of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • DocketRequest/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: NUNEZ, LEONARDO; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.