Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:21:44 (UTC).

NOYCE VS DOWNEY, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 NOYCE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DOWNEY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0040

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NOYCE, RIOLINDA B

Defendants

DOWNEY, JOHN

DOWNEY, SANDRA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: NOYCE, RIOLINDA B; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 511 6th Ave Taft, CA 93268; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against: DOWNEY, JOHN; DOWNEY, SANDRA; Party: Names: NOYCE, RIOLINDA B; DOWNEY, JOHN; DOWNEY, SANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: Property: 511 6th Ave, Taft, CA 93268 Returned via In ProPer/Linda Starkey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to John Downey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As t Sandra Downey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service as to Sandra Downey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Substituted Service as to John Downey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: NOYCE, RIOLINDA B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 511 6TH AVE TAFT, CA 93268 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned Via In ProPer Bin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less