This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 19:50:02 (UTC).

NOVASCONE VS NOVASCONE

Case Summary

On 04/16/2014 NOVASCONE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NOVASCONE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Pritchard, Kenneth G. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8122

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NOVASCONE, KELLY LYNN

Respondent

NOVASCONE, WILLIAM CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 10/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: NOVASCONE, KELLY LYNN; Respondent: NOVASCONE, WILLIAM CHARLES

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 10/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: NOVASCONE, KELLY LYNN; Respondent: NOVASCONE, WILLIAM CHARLES

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Ruling

Ruling DPG: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Default

MO-Default: Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Petitioner: NOVASCONE, KELLY LYNN

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 10/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 10/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DocketNotice of Insufficient Filing Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Petitioners Default Setting Card & Default Packet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration - Comment: PETITIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: PETITIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS DISSO SERVED 04/27/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: PETITIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less