This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/16/2023 at 09:24:46 (UTC).

NOVA CASUALTY COMPANY VS CALMINI PRODUCTS, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 NOVA CASUALTY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CALMINI PRODUCTS, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1404

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NOVA CASUALTY COMPANY

Defendant

CALMINI PRODUCTS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA RODOLFO

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

02/02/2021: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Writ of Execution Issued

02/16/2022: Writ of Execution Issued

Memorandum of Costs

02/07/2022: Memorandum of Costs

Notice of Change Name/Address

01/28/2022: Notice of Change Name/Address

Notice of Entry of Judgment

05/24/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

02/16/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Judgment by Default by Clerk

02/17/2021: Judgment by Default by Clerk

Declaration

02/16/2021: Declaration

Declaration

02/16/2021: Declaration

Declaration

02/16/2021: Declaration

Request For Entry of Default Not Entered

08/14/2020: Request For Entry of Default Not Entered

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

07/17/2020: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

02/26/2020: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

02/26/2020: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Summons Issued and Filed

02/26/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Statement of Classification and Location

02/20/2020: Statement of Classification and Location

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

02/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Complaint

02/20/2020: Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: Los Angeles County; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NOVA CASUALTY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Memorandum of Costs; Comment: After Judgment; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NOVA CASUALTY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Change Name/Address; Comment: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME, ADDRESS AND EMAIL ADDRESS; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NOVA CASUALTY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment; Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NOVA CASUALTY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Judgment by Default by Clerk; Comment: Against Calmini Products, Inc.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NOVA CASUALTY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service by Mail; Comment: Proof of Service by Mail; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NOVA CASUALTY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: SUMMARY OF THE CASE; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NOVA CASUALTY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: RE: CALCULATION OF JUDGMENT, INCLUDING INTEREST AND WAIVER OF ATTORNEY???S FEES C.C.P. '585; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NOVA CASUALTY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: 1033; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NOVA CASUALTY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1-10; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NOVA CASUALTY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f); Dept.: Bakersfield Department 12; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketFile Type: To ensure the public has access to court proceedings; Comment: during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court will be audio live streaming all non-confidential matters. This alternative method for observing courtroom proceedings is strongly encouraged during this time for all non-parties to avoid attending court in-person where social distancing protocols and limited courtroom access applies. It is also available because Judicial Officers may have to limit, or impose other reasonable restrictions upon, public access to their courtrooms and adjacent hallways based on recommended social distancing requirements. Each judge retains the discretion and authority to refuse, limit or terminate audio live streaming of the proceedings, or portions thereof, pursuant to the factors and prohibitions articulated in California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, and in consideration of other statutory and constitutional provisions.By Court Order and California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, audio live streams may NOT be recorded, broadcasted or rebroadcasted without prior written permission from the Court. Witnesses who have been instructed not to discuss their testimony or court proceedings with others may not listen to the audio streaming of any portion of the trial.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request For Entry of Default Not Entered; Comment: 1C DOES NOT CONFORM TO THE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Calmini Products, Inc. via personal service.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NOVA CASUALTY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NOVA CASUALTY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Statement of Classification and Location; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NOVA CASUALTY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NOVA CASUALTY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NOVA CASUALTY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less