This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 08:22:09 (UTC).

NORTH OF RIVER SANITARY DISTRICT NO.1, A PUBLIC AGENCY VS V.A.H., LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/31/2016 NORTH OF RIVER SANITARY DISTRICT NO 1, A PUBLIC AGENCY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against V A H , LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brumfield, Lorna H., Clark, Thomas S. and Chapin, Sidney P.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2046

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Clark, Thomas S.

Chapin, Sidney P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTH OF RIVER SANITARY DISTRICT NO.1, A PUBLIC AGENCY

Defendants

V.A.H., LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

BLATTELLA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

BLATTELLA, LLC

U.S FUND & INVESTMENT CONSULTANTS, INC.

SEQUOIA AFFORDABLE FAMILY HOUSING LP

U.S FUND & INVESTMENT CONSULTANTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

VAH, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUGHES, JOSEPH D

HOLDER, LISA A

Defendant Attorney

KELLEY, W PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER: DUPLICATE FILING. ANSWER FILED 2/1/17. VERIFICATION MUST BE FILED PROPERLY.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/14/16 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: WHY MATTTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 3 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: FCMC 10/23/17; COURT TRIAL 10/23/17; T/E 3 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional - Comment: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO SEQUOIA AFFORDABLE FAMILY HOUSING, LP AND FUND & INVESTMENT CONSULTANTS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT RE U.S. FUND & INVESTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AS TO SEQUOIA

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2016
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: ***THOMAS S CLARK***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Progress - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Comment: EXTENSION GRANTED - DOCUMENT CHECKED SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 02/01/17. THE 12/14/17 OSC RE SERVICE IS CONTINUED TO THE DATE OF THE CMC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • DocketCertificate of Progress

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Comment: 2ND REJECTION. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO SUBMIT A CERTIFICATE OF PROGRESS SEPERATELY FROM DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF INABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Comment: CERTIFICATE OF PROGRESS/ INABILITY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO SUBMIT CERTIFICATE OF PROGRESS SEPERATELY FROM DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF INABILITY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Served: 05/16/2017; Served: 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/14/16 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less