This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:44:29 (UTC).

NORRIS VS NORRIS (B)

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 NORRIS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NORRIS B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fielder, John L., Compton, James L., Schuett, Stephen D., Stainfield, Bryan K. and Cannon, Gloria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1637

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fielder, John L.

Compton, James L.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Cannon, Gloria

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NORRIS, OLENA

Respondent

NORRIS, JAMES A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

ETCHEVERRY-BARNES, PAIGE M

STOKER, IRA L

Respondent Attorney

SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 12/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/12/16 RES MOD S/S CONT'D FROM 2/16/17 5/04/17 8/10/17; Parties Present Petitioner: NORRIS, OLENA; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L; Respondent: NORRIS, JAMES A; Attorney: SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT'D FROM 3/09/17, 5/04/17 AND 8/10/17; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L; Respondent; Attorney: SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 08/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/12/16 RES MOD S/S CONT'D FROM 2/16/17 5/04/17; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L; Respondent; Attorney: SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L

Request for Order - Respondent

12/2/16 MO: Request for Order - Respondent: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES MOD C/V S/S MOTOR VEHICLE 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 11/22/16; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L; Respondent; Attorney: SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L

Request for Order - Petitioner

08/08/16 MO: REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET APPRAISAL OF PROP; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L; Respondent; Attorney: SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L

Request for Order - Petitioner

02/24/16 REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER CHILD CUSTODY, CHILD VISITATION, DRUG TESTING STATEMENT OF: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/C C/V DRUG TEST STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR **JUDGES NOTES AND EXHIBITS**; Parties Present Petitioner: NORRIS, OLENA; Respondent; Attorney: SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L

Request for Order - Petitioner

02/11/16 MO; PETITIONER CHILD CUSTODY, CHILD VISITATION, DRUG TESTING STATEMENT OF DECISION: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET CC CV DRUG TEST STMT OF DEC 1 MINOR **JUDGES NOTES AND EXHIBITS**; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L

Request for Order - Petitioner

MO 11/10/15 RFO PET: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: C/C C/V DRUG TESTING 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 11/9/15 STATUS ONLY; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L

Request for Order - Petitioner

MO 11/9/15 RFO PET: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET CC CV DRUG TEST STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 10/07/15 **STATUS ONLY**

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 02/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES MOD S/S CONT'D FROM 12/2/16; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STOKER, IRA L; Respondent; Attorney: SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L

Request for Order - Respondent

11/22/2016 MO - REQUEST FOR ORDER - RESPONDENT VISITATION AND SPOUSAL SUPPORT: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES MOD C/V S/S MOTOR VEHICLE 1 MINOR; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L

Request for Order - Respondent

04/06/16 MO; RESPONDENT PETITIONER CUSTODY/VISITAITON DRUG TESTING STATEMENT OF DECISION: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES MOD C/V 1 MINOR TIME EST 2-3 HOURS

Request for Order - Respondent

02/24/16 RESPONDENT MODIFICATION OF CHILD VISITATION: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES MOD C/V 1 MINOR ( counsel only); Parties Present Petitioner: NORRIS, OLENA; Respondent; Attorney: SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L

Request for Order - Respondent

02/11/16 MO: RESPONDENT MODIFICATION OF CHILD VISITATION: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES MOD C/V 1 MINOR; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L

Request for Order - Petitioner

REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET C/C C/V DRUG TESTING 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 11/10/15; Parties Present Petitioner: NORRIS, OLENA; Respondent: NORRIS, JAMES A; Attorney: SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L

Request for Order - Petitioner

PET RFO M/O: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/C C/V DRUG TEST STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: NORRIS, OLENA; Respondent: NORRIS, JAMES A; Attorney: SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L

Request for Order - Petitioner

PET RFO - RESP DOES NOT STIP TO COMMISSIONER: MO; Request for Order: Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET C/C C/V DRUG TEST STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR NO SERVICE; Parties Present Petitioner: NORRIS, OLENA

Ex Parte Hearing

PET EX PARTE GRANTED: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET EX PARTE C/C C/V DRUG TEST 1 MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: NORRIS, OLENA; Respondent: NORRIS, JAMES A

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Petitioner 01/22/2020: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions Held; Comment: 10/12/16 RES MOD SS CONT FROM 2/16/17 5/4/17 8/10/17/12/13/17 2/26/18 10/24/19 10/31/18 6/17/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 01/22/2020: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/16/19 PET SALE OF PROP CONT FROM 2/27/19 3/7/19 6/17/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to be Relieved / Withdraw - Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw 08/02/2019: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 07/02/19 RES NOM TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Re: NOM TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL Hearing Date:08/02/19 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING; RETURN VIA ATTORNEY BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 06/17/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING; RETURN VIA ATTORNEY BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Motion 05/17/2019: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 4/22/19 NOM TO BE RELIEVED 16COURT+5CAL-16COURT+3CAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketDrug Screening Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketDrug Screening Report

    Read MoreRead Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2015
  • DocketDrug Screening Report - Comment: Date of Sample: 8/18/15; Type of Sample: (U)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • DocketNo Mediation Agreement - Comment: MEDIATOR; MARIO CORREA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - PET CUSTODY, VISITATION, DRUG TESTING CONTINUANCE: Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/C C/V PROPERTY CONTROL; DRUG TESTING; STATEMENT OF DECISION 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Original Type: Mediation Appointment; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: Set by Barnes-Mother

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: PET C/C C/V PROPERTY CONTROL; DRUG TESTING; STATEMENT OF DECISION 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less