This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 23:47:29 (UTC).

NORA JEAN GOMES TRUST

Case Summary

On 04/20/2015 NORA JEAN GOMES TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Wyatt, Ralph W., Loo, Cynthia L., Bittleston, Dawn and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4911

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Wyatt, Ralph W.

Loo, Cynthia L.

Bittleston, Dawn

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GOMES, RICK LAWRENCE

Decedent and Not Classified By Court

GOMES, NORA JEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

OLDFIELD, GERALD H

 

Court Documents

Further Case Management Conference

09/08/2017 MO: Further Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - Continued CMC on Petition for Breach of Trust by Foirmer Trustee and Surcharges for Breach of Trust; Parties Present Petitioner: GOMES, RICK LAWRENCE; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H

Further Case Management Conference

09/01/2017 MO: Petition for Breach of Trust: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - CMC re: Petition for Breach of Trust; Parties Present Petitioner: GOMES, RICK LAWRENCE; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H

Compliance Hearing

(2) Case Management Conference and Compliance Hearing 06/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - COMPLIANCE HRG SAME NOTES - 1. Document filed 3/13/17 not in compliance re filing of an accounting. Need proper filing of an accounting for period from 1/18/10 - 9/1/15, which should be attached to a petition & be set for hearing. 2. No proof of service attached to Accounting & Response filed 3/13/17. 6/22/17 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 04/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - CMC RE PETITION FOR BREACH OF TRUST BY FORMER TRUSTEE AND SURCHARGES FOR BREACH OF TRUST 4/21/17 CALENDAR #2; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 04/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES - 1. Document filed 3/13/17 not in compliance re filing of an accounting. Need proper filing of an accounting for period from 1/18/10 - 9/1/15, which should be attached to a petition & be set for hearing. 2. Affidavit of Change of Trustee attached in Exhibit C is missing pages 2 - 4. 3. No proof of service attached to Accounting & Response filed 3/13/17.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 03/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - re: accounting and other ordered information NOTE - 1. As of 02/22/17, Linda Shepherd has not submitted for filing an accounting, record an Affidavit of Date of Death with City Recorder, Provide all trust beneficiaries with a copy of the final closing statement for the sale of real property at 6 Wetherly Drive, Bakersfield, CA, Prepare and file Inventory and Accounting from 01/18/10 - 09/01/15.; Parties Present Petitioner: GOMES, RICK LAWRENCE; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Accounting...returned via Attorney out basket

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 02/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR BREACH OF TRUST BY FORMER TRUSTEE AND SURCHARGES FOR BREACH OF TRUST [Probate Code 17200(b)(5); 17200(b)(12);16420(a)(2); 16420(a)(9); 16440(a)(3); 17206]; Parties Present Petitioner: GOMES, RICK LAWRENCE; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H

Petition

MO PETITION FOR BREACH: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR BREACH OF TRUST BY FORMER TRUSTEE AND SURCHARGES FOR BREACH OF TRUST [Probate Code 17200(b)(5); 17200(b)(12);16420(a)(2); 16420(a)(9); 16440(a)(3); 17206]; Parties Present Petitioner: GOMES, RICK LAWRENCE; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H

Petition

Petition 09/15/2016: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR BREACH OF TRUST BY FORMER TRUSTEE AND SURCHARGES FOR BREACH OF TRUST [Probate Code 17200(b)(5); 17200(b)(12);16420(a)(2); 16420(a)(9); 16440(a)(3); 17206]; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H

Petition

PETITION: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner: GOMES, RICK LAWRENCE; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H

Further Hearing

FURTHER HEARING RE: MEDIATION: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: MEDIATION ONLY; Parties Present Petitioner: GOMES, RICK LAWRENCE; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H

Petition

Petition to remove Trustee and Appt Successor 070215: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. Need original Will lodged & endorsed copy filed in case no. PB-64911.; Parties Present Petitioner: GOMES, RICK LAWRENCE; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: re: accounting and other ordered information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: re: petition for breach of trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketMediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - 09/08/2017 MO: Further Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - Continued CMC on Petition for Breach of Trust by Foirmer Trustee and Surcharges for Breach of Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - 09/01/2017 MO: Petition for Breach of Trust: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - CMC re: Petition for Breach of Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - (2) Case Management Conference and Compliance Hearing 06/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - CMC RE PETITION FOR BREACH OF TRUST BY FORMER TRUSTEE AND SURCHARGES FOR BREACH OF TRUST 6/22/17 CALENDAR #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - (2) Case Management Conference and Compliance Hearing 06/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - COMPLIANCE HRG SAME NOTES - 1. Document filed 3/13/17 not in compliance re filing of an accounting. Need proper filing of an accounting for period from 1/18/10 - 9/1/15, which should be attached to a petition & be set for hearing. 2. No proof of service attached to Accounting & Response filed 3/13/17. 6/22/17 CALENDAR #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: re: filing of accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR BREACH OF TRUST BY FORMER TRUSTEE AND SURCHARGES FOR BREACH OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - COMPLIANCE HRG SAME NOTES - 1. Document filed 3/13/17 not in compliance re filing of an accounting. Need proper filing of an accounting for period from 1/18/10 - 9/1/15, which should be attached to a petition & be set for hearing. 2. No proof of service attached to Accounting & Response filed 3/13/17. 4/21/17 CALENDAR #1

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Hearing - FURTHER HEARING RE: MEDIATION: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: MEDIATION ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Docket4011 Petition - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition to remove Trustee and Appt Successor 070215: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. Need original Will lodged & endorsed copy filed in case no. PB-64911.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: To Petition to Remove Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 7/2/2015 @ 9:00am in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketNew Case Filed - Comment: Post Conversion Addition for Reporting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketPetition - Comment: PETITION TO REMOVE TRUSTEE AND TO APPOINT SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE (PROBATE CODE 17200(B)(10) 15642(B)(3)(4)) 7/2/15 9:00AM P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Docket879D PMT: Probate Petitions, Objections or Other - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for GOMES, RICK LAWRENCE (PE-1). Received from GERALD H OLDFIELD, check no(s) 3405. Receipt #834513 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.