This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 09:04:22 (UTC).

NOEL VS HERNANDEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 NOEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0102

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NOEL, WINSTON

Defendants

HERNANDEZ, ELSA

HERNANDEZ, VALENTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AARON, ROBERT S.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 04/30/2021 Hearing Time: 9:15AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Cont'd from 4/30/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: Judge Barmann Dept. 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 04/30/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 04/30/2021 Hearing Time: 9:15AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AARON, ROBERT S.