This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:43:35 (UTC).

NOAH LEE MATHIS DECEASED

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 NOAH LEE MATHIS DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2300

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MATHIS, JESSE

MATHIS, JERRY

 

Court Documents

Petition to Determine Succession

Petition to Determine Succession 11/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTES - 1. Petitioners indicate decedent had a predeceased spouse, however Death Certificate reflects he was married at time of death to Judy Mathis. Spouse is not listed in petition or one of the petitioners. Need an amended petition to include spouse Judy Mathis as a party petitioner. 2. Petition does not list any personal property. What personal property assets do petitioners request to succeed to? Need a Supplemental Inventory filed together w/an Attachment 11 listing the personal property assets. 3. Attachment 11 must also include decedent's interest in the property (i.e. 100%). Need verified supplement identifying decedent's interest. 4. #13 does not set forth the specific property interest claimed by each petitioner. 5. #17 is marked indicating decedent was the subject of a Conservatorship at time of death. Were petitioners the Court-appt'd Conservators of decedent? Need clarification by way of verified supplement.

Petition to Determine Succession

6/8/17 MO: Petition to Determine Succession: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES - 1. Petitioners indicate decedent had a predeceased spouse, however Death Certificate reflects he was married at time of death to Judy Mathis. Spouse is not listed in petition or one of the petitioners. Need an amended petition to include spouse Judy Mathis as a party petitioner. 2. Petition does not list any personal property. What personal property assets do petitioners request to succeed to? Need a Supplemental Inventory filed together w/an Attachment 11 listing the personal property assets. 3. Attachment 11 must also include decedent's interest in the property (i.e. 100%). Need verified supplement identifying decedent's interest. 4. #13 does not set forth the specific property interest claimed by each petitioner. 5. #17 is marked indicating decedent was the subject of a Conservatorship at time of death. Were petitioners the Court-appt'd Conservators of decedent? Need clarification by way of verified supplement.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition to determine...returned via pro per outbasket "M"

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Determine Succession - Petition to Determine Succession 11/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTES - 1. Petitioners indicate decedent had a predeceased spouse, however Death Certificate reflects he was married at time of death to Judy Mathis. Spouse is not listed in petition or one of the petitioners. Need an amended petition to include spouse Judy Mathis as a party petitioner. 2. Petition does not list any personal property. What personal property assets do petitioners request to succeed to? Need a Supplemental Inventory filed together w/an Attachment 11 listing the personal property assets. 3. Attachment 11 must also include decedent's interest in the property (i.e. 100%). Need verified supplement identifying decedent's interest. 4. #13 does not set forth the specific property interest claimed by each petitioner. 5. #17 is marked indicating decedent was the subject of a Conservatorship at time of death. Were petitioners the Court-appt'd Conservators of decedent? Need clarification by way of verified supplement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Determine Succession - 6/8/17 MO: Petition to Determine Succession: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES - 1. Petitioners indicate decedent had a predeceased spouse, however Death Certificate reflects he was married at time of death to Judy Mathis. Spouse is not listed in petition or one of the petitioners. Need an amended petition to include spouse Judy Mathis as a party petitioner. 2. Petition does not list any personal property. What personal property assets do petitioners request to succeed to? Need a Supplemental Inventory filed together w/an Attachment 11 listing the personal property assets. 3. Attachment 11 must also include decedent's interest in the property (i.e. 100%). Need verified supplement identifying decedent's interest. 4. #13 does not set forth the specific property interest claimed by each petitioner. 5. #17 is marked indicating decedent was the subject of a Conservatorship at time of death. Were petitioners the Court-appt'd Conservators of decedent? Need clarification by way of verified supplement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketPetition to Determine Succession - Comment: Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property and Personal Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition to determine...returned via pro per outbasket "M"

    Read MoreRead Less