This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 02:50:34 (UTC).

NIRAV PATEL VS SWARAN BILLING

Case Summary

On 05/09/2017 NIRAV PATEL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SWARAN BILLING. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Schuett, Stephen D., Lampe, David R. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1039

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

PATEL, NIRAV

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SWARAN BILLING

BILLING TRANSPORTATION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KAUR, MANJIT

BILLING, SWARAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERLMAN, SCOTT D

Defendant Attorney

KUMPEL, FREDERICK

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Scott D. Perlman For: Two Letters Received Reason:At request of Plaintiff's attorney office. Letter was submitted in error.

Ruling

Ruling 02/21/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To:Scott D. Perlman For: Summons on First Amended Complaint Reason: NO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ON FILE.

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 07/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: PERLMAN, SCOTT D; Defendant: SWARAN BILLING

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE; STIPULATION TO AMEND RETURNED VIA PRO PER "S"

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Swaran Billing Document: Defendant's Second Amended Answer to Paintiff's Verified Complaint and Interpreter Declaration Must seek leave of court to allow filing of second amended answer. (Mailed)

Motion for Judgment

Motion for Judgment 02/06/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/5/18 Plaintiff, NIRAV PATEL Motion for Entry of Judgment ResID: 28795; Parties Present Defendant: SWARAN BILLING

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 11/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: PERLMAN, SCOTT D

Motion for Judgment on Pleadings

Motion for Judgment on Pleadings 10/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/25/17 Plaintiff NIRAV PATEL Motion for Judgment on the pleadings ResID: 26884 **************************************************** TENTATIVE: GRANT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. DENY SANCTIONS. *****************************************************; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: PERLMAN, SCOTT D; Defendant: SWARAN BILLING

Ruling

Ruling 03/17/2020: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 03/02/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

SDS Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Final Case Management Conference/Trial (N1):

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: (Proposed) Order - Proposed Order was filed on 7/2/19 - if this is an Amended Proposed Order please indicate that on the document.

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel 06/26/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 5/29/19 Plaintiff, NIRAV PATEL Motion to Compel Defendant Swaran Billing's Responses to Form Interrogatories ResID: 35033

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Scott D. Perlman For: Notice of Ruling Reason: Please indicate Proposed Order is attached to the Notice.

Demurrer

Demurrer 03/26/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 2/15/19 Defendant, MANJIT KAUR Demurrer to Complaint

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 01/22/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filing Date: 1/18/19 Filing Party: Plaintiff Application for order continuing trial date and memorandum of points and authorities in support thereof.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: First Amended Complaint, Summons

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT T/E 2- 3 DAYS **Continued pursuant to standing order**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCourt Use Only - Pre-Cleared Regular - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Pre-Cleared Reservation Expired; Comment: Filing Party: Plaintiff, NIRAV PATEL Motion to Compel Contact: Patricia Nelson - (661) 328-1986 Paperwork Due: 3/25/20 **Continued pursuant to standing order**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Continued from 04/10/2020 by Standing Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/17/2020: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/02/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Consent of parties or their lawyers to confer separately with settlement conference judge pro tem ret. Gary T. Friedman in department 1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement - Comment: MSC Statement of Plaintiff, Nirav Patel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Minute Order 11/19/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 11/19/2019: Judicial Officer(s): Friedman, Gary T., Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FCMC & CT 4/27/20 T/E 2-3 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement - Comment: as to Defendant's Billing Trasportation and Manjit Kaur

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Demurring Party in support of Automatic Extension

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Scott D. Perlman, Esq pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Section 430.41 to meet and confer prior to Plaintiff filing a Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO SWARAN BILLING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to SWARAN BILLING, SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 8/23/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 06/07/2017; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less