This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/07/2022 at 10:21:07 (UTC).

NIPPER VS MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 NIPPER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S., Hopper, Tina, Clark, Thomas S., Hopper, Tina and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0970

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S., Hopper, Tina

Clark, Thomas S.

Hopper, Tina

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NIPPER, BRESHA

Defendants

MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC

LOVE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GERAMI, HADI

GERAMI HADI

Defendant Attorneys

RUGGERELLO, KRISTAN L.

RUGGERELLO KRISTAN L.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/17/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

Amended Notice

08/16/2022: Amended Notice

Ruling

08/10/2022: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

07/26/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts

07/21/2022: Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts

Declaration

07/21/2022: Declaration

Exhibits in Support

07/21/2022: Exhibits in Support

Notice of Motion

07/21/2022: Notice of Motion

Case Management Conference

11/01/2021: Case Management Conference

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

11/03/2021: Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

10/15/2021: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Electronic Rejection Notice

10/14/2021: Electronic Rejection Notice

Case Management Statement

10/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

10/12/2021: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

10/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer to Complaint

06/28/2021: Answer to Complaint

Order to Show Cause

05/04/2021: Order to Show Cause

Summons Issued and Filed

05/04/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Final Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion for Summary Judgment; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Amended Notice; Comment: of motion for summary judgment; Filed By: DEFENDANT - LOVE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP. INC.|DEFENDANT - MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Motion for Summary Judgment: Your Motion has been filed but not calendared. Department 17 is located at 1415 Truxtun Ave. Bakersfield, CA 93301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts; Comment: Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts; Filed By: DEFENDANT - LOVE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP. INC.|DEFENDANT - MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Ryan P. Ruggerello ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, Summary Adjudication; Filed By: DEFENDANT - LOVE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP. INC.|DEFENDANT - MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Exhibits in Support; Comment: Index of Exhibits ISO Defendants Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, Summary Adjudication; Filed By: DEFENDANT - LOVE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP. INC.|DEFENDANT - MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees; Filed By: DEFENDANT - LOVE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP. INC.|DEFENDANT - MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit (Envelope Id# 7467359)Please correct document title as it does not correspond with the filing code selected nor the text within the body.; Filed By: DEFENDANT - LOVE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP. INC.|DEFENDANT - MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement; Filed By: DEFENDANT - LOVE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP. INC.|DEFENDANT - MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NIPPER, BRESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NIPPER, BRESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Comment: Answer to Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - LOVE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP. INC.|DEFENDANT - MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 08/17/2021Hearing Time: 8:30AMHearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NIPPER, BRESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NIPPER, BRESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NIPPER, BRESHA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOVE AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC. DBA BAKERSFIELD MAZDA is a litigant

Latest cases where Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUGGERELLO KRISTAN LOUISE