This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 20:04:12 (UTC).

NIBBELINK MASONRY VS CLARK BROS.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2015 NIBBELINK MASONRY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CLARK BROS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4199

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION, CORP.

Defendants

CLARK BROS., INC.

NORTH EDWARDS WATER DISTRICT

TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DERRYBERRY, ROBERT STEVEN

Attorney at KESTLER | DERRYBERRY LLP

641 W Lancaster Blvd #205

Lancaster, CA 93534

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Kern County has no jurisdiction. Case was transfered to San Bernardino. Returned via SASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Kern County has no jurisdiction. Case was transfered to San Bernardino. Returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • Docket4153 Case Management Conference - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: case stayed on 4/15/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: case stayed on 4/15/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketReceipt for Records Returned - Comment: Received From: ANITA JOHNSON CIVDS 1511273

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketNotice of Transfer of Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry - Comment: of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Comment: Case Numbers S-1500-CV-284199; S-1500-CV-284661 and BCV-15-100503 are Transfered to San Bernardino County. Cases will be consolidated in San Bernardino County. ***JUDGE LORNA H. BRUMFIELD***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: JONATHAN DUNN RE: "COPY" OF STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER RELATED CASES TO SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT (WHERE THEY WILL BE CONSOLIDATED IN ORDER TO PERFORM TRANSFER, THE FOLLWING ARE NEEDED: (1) THREE CERTIFIED COPIES OF STIPULATION AND ORDER EXECUTED BY SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT ON 10-15-15 ..ONE FOR EACH CASE WITH KERN COUNTY. (2) THREE SEPARATE CHECKS IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00 TRANSFER FEE PAYABLE TO THE KERN COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT .ONE FOR EACH CASE WITH KERN COUNTY. (3) THREE SEPARATE CHECKS IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00 PAYABLE TO THE SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT FOR ISSUANCE OF NEW CASE NUMBERS WITH SAID COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) - Comment: CV-284661 BCV-15-100503

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: RE: STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • DocketNP1821 - Comment: Department: 11 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: REQUEST FOR ORDER OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING COMPLETION OF PRELITIGATION PROCEDURES PURSUANT TO CONTRACT. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THIS ACTION IS STAYED PENDING RESOLUTION OF KERN COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT CASE NUMBER S-1500-CV-283924. THE COURT SETS AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STAY ON 4/15/2015 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 11. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 17, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_11 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 17, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_11 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION, CORP. (PL-1). Received from KESTLER DERRYBERRY, LLP, check no(s) 1265. Receipt #825603 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY ROBERT DERRYBERRY CMC SET 8/31/15 @8:30AM DEPT 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY ROBERT DERRYBERRY CMC SET 8/31/15 @8:30AM DEPT 11

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH EDWARDS WATER DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where CLARK BROS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where NIBBLELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant