This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/12/2023 at 07:37:45 (UTC).

NGUYEN VS CRST EXPEDITED INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 NGUYEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CRST EXPEDITED INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1206

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NGUYEN, DIEM

Defendants

CRST EXPEDITED, INC.

CARDOZA, AUSTIN ALEXANDER LOUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATWAL SUKHTEJ H.

Defendant Attorneys

METSCH JOCELYN S

TRACHTMAN BENJAMIN R

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal (Entire)

03/01/2023: Request for Dismissal (Entire)

Notice

01/19/2023: Notice

Further Case Management Conference

01/19/2023: Further Case Management Conference

Substitution of Attorneys

01/06/2023: Substitution of Attorneys

Substitution of Attorneys

01/06/2023: Substitution of Attorneys

Case Management Statement

01/10/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

01/06/2023: Case Management Statement

Electronic Rejection Notice

01/09/2023: Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice

01/06/2023: Electronic Rejection Notice

Notice of Order to Appear

09/20/2022: Notice of Order to Appear

Notice of Order to Appear

09/19/2022: Notice of Order to Appear

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

09/07/2022: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Electronic Rejection Notice

06/17/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

06/16/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Order to Show Cause

05/25/2022: Order to Show Cause

Summons Issued and Filed

05/25/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

05/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Complaint

05/17/2022: Complaint

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Entire); Comment: With Prejudice; Filed By: DEFENDANT - CARDOZA, AUSTIN ALEXANDER LOUIS|DEFENDANT - CRST EXPEDITED, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice; Comment: Notice of Ruling-Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal set to 4/11/23, 8:30 a.m., Div. J, Also, Final CMC; Filed By: DEFENDANT - CARDOZA, AUSTIN ALEXANDER LOUIS|DEFENDANT - CRST EXPEDITED, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: DEFENDANT - CARDOZA, AUSTIN ALEXANDER LOUIS|DEFENDANT - CRST EXPEDITED, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Re: Case Management Statement CM-110 Form is outdated, please use revised form dated 09/1/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Substitution of Attorneys; Comment: as to Austin Alexander Louis Cardoza; Filed By: DEFENDANT - CARDOZA, AUSTIN ALEXANDER LOUIS|DEFENDANT - CRST EXPEDITED, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Substitution of Attorneys; Comment: as to CRST Expedited, Inc.; Filed By: DEFENDANT - CARDOZA, AUSTIN ALEXANDER LOUIS|DEFENDANT - CRST EXPEDITED, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NGUYEN, DIEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Re Case Management Statement:Version of CM-110 filed is outdated, please use correct version dated 9/1/2021;Correct Address of the Court is 1215 Truxtun Avenue.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - CARDOZA, AUSTIN ALEXANDER LOUIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Comment: CRST EXPEDITED, INC.; Filed By: DEFENDANT - CRST EXPEDITED, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Appear; Comment: Notice of Order to Appear and Show Cause Why Sanctions Should Not Be ImposedTO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, SUKHTEJ H. ATWAL IF ANY:You and each of you, are ordered to appear before the court on October 27, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. in Division J, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why sanctions in the amount of $250.00 should not be imposed for your failure to comply with the Special Rules for Administration of Civil Litigation and more specifically: for failing to appear at Order to Show Cause re: California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NGUYEN, DIEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Appear; Comment: TO: SUKHTEJ H. ATWALYOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR in the above entitled court to give any legal reason why the Special Rules for Administration of Civil Litigation could not be met..All appearances are mandatory, unless dismissal of the entire action is filed five (5) court days prior to the hearing.If this is a notice for failure to file a dismissal of the entire action as ordered by the Court, payment of sanctions must be paid at the time the Request for Dismissal is submitted.If there is any conflict of time, written requests only, showing just cause for change of the hearing date are required ten (10)court days prior to the hearing.If parties are in compliance and sanctions of $250.00 are paid five (5) court days prior to the hearing, then no appearance isnecessary. If this is a second time, sanctions of $250.00 are required to be paid.This will also serve as notice that sanctions pursuant to CCP 177.5 and 575.2 will be before the court and ruled upon atthat time.The hearing is set for October 27, 2022, at 8:30 a.m. in Division J as a result of for failing to appear at Order to ShowCause re: California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 scheduled for September 7, 2022.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NGUYEN, DIEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Austin Alexander Louis Cardooza, via personal service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NGUYEN, DIEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 09/07/2022Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NGUYEN, DIEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NGUYEN, DIEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NGUYEN, DIEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less