This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:54:01 (UTC).

NEWHOUSE VS MCFARLAND UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 NEWHOUSE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MCFARLAND UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2500

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWHOUSE, RONALD R.

Defendants

MAGORIAN, STACEY LOWELL

MCFARLAND UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY

MCFARLAND UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

MCFARLAND UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLARK, MATTHEW C

Defendant Attorney

HAGAN, CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Service. One defendant per Proof of Service.

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 05/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: HAGAN, CHRISTOPHER; Defendant; Attorney: HAGAN, CHRISTOPHER

Ruling

Ruling 04/14/2017: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO: CHRISTOPHER J. HAGAN RE: CMC STATEMENT REASON: HEARING DATE IS INCORRECT REASON: HEARING DATE IS INCORRECT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2018
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Jury requested by all parties. 5-7 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: Jury requested by all parties; JT 04/23/18; 5-7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Conference 05/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: HAGAN, CHRISTOPHER; Defendant; Attorney: HAGAN, CHRISTOPHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO: CHRISTOPHER J. HAGAN RE: CMC STATEMENT REASON: HEARING DATE IS INCORRECT REASON: HEARING DATE IS INCORRECT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Ruling - Ruling 04/14/2017: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO MCFARLAND UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO STACEY LOWELL MAGORIAN, SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Service. One defendant per Proof of Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Notice - Comment: of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/06/17 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less