This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 21:48:51 (UTC).

NEUTRA BUILDERS, INC. VS CORESTATES CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 NEUTRA BUILDERS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CORESTATES CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0136

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEUTRA BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

CORESTATES CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC., A GEORGIA CORPORATION

THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GOLDEN STATE SUPPLY LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A NEW HAMPSHIRE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARLTON ANDREW C

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 05/04/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

Complaint

01/18/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

01/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

01/19/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Order to Show Cause

01/19/2022: Order to Show Cause

Notice of Lis Pendens

01/31/2022: Notice of Lis Pendens

Request for Dismissal (Entire)

03/10/2022: Request for Dismissal (Entire)

Release of Lis Pendens

03/10/2022: Release of Lis Pendens

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Release of Lis Pendens; Comment: Release of Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NEUTRA BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Entire); Comment: with prejudice as to the entire action of all parties and all causes of action; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NEUTRA BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Lis Pendens; Comment: Notice of Recordation of Notice of Pending Action (Lis Pendens)[CCP 405.22]NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the "Notice of Pending Action (Lis Pendens)"recorded in the Los Angeles County Recorder's Office as Instrument No.: 000222011554,attached hereto as Exhibit A.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NEUTRA BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 05/04/2022Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NEUTRA BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NEUTRA BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NEUTRA BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Corestates Construction Services, Inc., a Georgia Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where GOLDEN STATE SUPPLY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant