This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2023 at 14:02:11 (UTC).

NAVA VS ALEXANDER TRUCKING, INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 NAVA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALEXANDER TRUCKING, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0260

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAVA, ALMA OCHOA

Defendants

GORMAN, MARCUM SHANE

ALEXANDER TRUCKING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANISH BRIAN J

 

Court Documents

Complaint

01/26/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

01/26/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

01/27/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Order to Show Cause

01/27/2023: Order to Show Cause

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Division H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 5/12/2023 Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NAVA, ALMA OCHOA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NAVA, ALMA OCHOA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NAVA, ALMA OCHOA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less