This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:29:41 (UTC).

NATIONWIDE REALTY GROUP VS ESTRADA

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 NATIONWIDE REALTY GROUP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ESTRADA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5905

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONWIDE REALTY GROUP

Defendants

ESTRADA, ROSALLE

FIGEROA, JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: NATIONWIDE REALTY GROUP; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 7612 PACK SADDLE CT BAKERSFIELD, CA 93309 KERN COUNTY; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: ESTRADA, ROSALLE; FIGEROA, JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA SVAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered - Comment: AS TO ROSALLE ESTRADA AND JOSE FIGEROA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AS TO ROSALLE ESTRADA AND JOSE FIGEROA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): item #1 c name does not conform to complaint & Item #6 b (2). Returned via SVAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: any person claiming any right to possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: by sub service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: by personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN, NATIONWIDE REALTY GROUP; Served: 10/16/2017; Served: 10/16/20175:35 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 7612 PACK SADDLE CT, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93309

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less