This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/22/2020 at 08:48:12 (UTC).

NATIONWIDE AGRIBUSINESS INSURANCE COMPANY VS CHAVEZ

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 NATIONWIDE AGRIBUSINESS INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHAVEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2229

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONWIDE AGRIBUSINESS INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

CHAVEZ, GUADALUPE N.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEAL, MICHAEL R

Defendant Attorney

REISINGER, ROBERT L

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/6/21 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 17

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury - Comment: Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Guadalupe N. Chavez: Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/6/21 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less