This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/16/2022 at 22:25:53 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC VS GRAHAM ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GRAHAM. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1193

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC DBA CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

Defendants

GRAHAM, DAVID R.

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIKA BRANDON J

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

10/28/2019: Case Management Conference

Proof of Service

10/22/2019: Proof of Service

Judgment by Default by Court

10/28/2019: Judgment by Default by Court

Points and Authorities

10/22/2019: Points and Authorities

Request

10/22/2019: Request

Request for Judicial Notice

10/22/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration

10/22/2019: Declaration

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

10/22/2019: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Request for Court Judgment

10/22/2019: Request for Court Judgment

Notice of Lis Pendens

05/28/2019: Notice of Lis Pendens

Electronic Rejection Notice

05/23/2019: Electronic Rejection Notice

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

05/15/2019: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Electronic Rejection Notice

05/14/2019: Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice

05/13/2019: Electronic Rejection Notice

Order to Show Cause

05/01/2019: Order to Show Cause

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

04/30/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

05/01/2019: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint

04/30/2019: Complaint

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 12; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Judgment by Default by Court; Comment: In favor of Nationstar Mortgage, LLC dba Champion Mortgage Company; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC DBA CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC DBA CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Points and Authorities; Comment: Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff;s Request for Entry of Default Judgment; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC DBA CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request; Comment: Request for Waiver of Live Testimony; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC DBA CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Judicial Notice; Comment: Request for Judicial Notice; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC DBA CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: in Support of Default Judgment; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC DBA CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: Without prejudice as to Doees 1-50; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC DBA CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Court Judgment; Comment: As to David R Graham on complaint filed 4/30/19; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC DBA CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC DBA CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Defendant Secretary of Housing and Urban Development; Personal (2nd Proof); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC DBA CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Lis Pendens; Comment: Notice of Pendency of Action; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC DBA CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: To:Brandon Mika; Re:Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint; Reason:Already received a Proof of Service for this defendant filed on 05/15/2019, if this is Amended please notate that on the document and resubmit. Also Name of party served does not match the summons and complaint- needs correction on #3.a. and #6.d.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Defendant Secretary of Housing and Urban Development; Personal; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC DBA CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: To:Brandon Mika; Re:Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint; Reason:Name of party served does not match the summons and complaint; needs correction on #3.a. and #6.d. (Please list only what is named on the summons/complaint under party served.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: To:Brandon Mika; Re:Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint; Reason:Name of party served does not match the summons and complaint; needs correction on #3.a.; also please note if person listed in #3.b. is authorized to accept

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 08/14/2019Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC DBA CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC DBA CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC DBA CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secretary of Housing and Urban Development is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIKA BRANDON J