This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 16:38:43 (UTC).

NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSRUANCE VS THOR MOTOR COACH, INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSRUANCE filed an Other lawsuit against THOR MOTOR COACH, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1664

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSRUANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURG, PA "AIG"

Defendants

THOR MOTOR COACH, INC

KEY SAFETY SYSTEMS, INC

NORCO INDUSTRIES, INC.

ADNIK INDUSTRIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GASKINS, JORDAN R.

Defendant Attorneys

MOHRMAN, HANNAH L

BUSH, TAMARA A.

LEHMAN, MICHAEL E

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Summons

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 01/19/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: TMC's Answer to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Insufficient Filing Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: DEFENDANT KEY SAFETY SYSTEMS, INC. D B A JOYSON SAFETY SYSTEMS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint - $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase Consolidated - Child Case - Comment: ALL FILING TO BE MADE INTO THE LEAD CASE BCV-17-100886

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORCO INDUSTRIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Key Safety Systems (KSS) is a litigant

Latest cases where National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, PA is a litigant

Latest cases where Thor Motor Coach, Inc. is a litigant