This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:55:24 (UTC).

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2006-3, A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST(S) VS WILSON ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2006-3, A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST S filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WILSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0456

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2006-3, A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST(S)

Defendants

WILSON, DIYONNA M.

WILLIAMS, MONICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, MICHAEL D

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CRC 3.110: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for failure to appear at Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110, failure to file Certificate of Progress and failure to follow rules of court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • Order to Appear - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: as to plaintiff counsel Michael D. Kahn as to why sanctions in the amount of $250 should not be imposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FILED BY MICHAEL R. BOULANGER, ESQ ENDORSED COPY RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Notice of Order to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CRC 3.110: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/29/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less