This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:55:20 (UTC).

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2006-2, A DELWARE STATUTORY TRUST(S) VS LEE

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2006-2, A DELWARE STATUTORY TRUST S filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LEE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chapin, Sidney P.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0455

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chapin, Sidney P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2006-2, A DELWARE STATUTORY TRUST(S)

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

LEE, THERESA

Cross Defendant

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2006-2, A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, MICHAEL D

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

DJIVRE, ALEXIS B

 

Court Documents

Motion (Pre-Disposition)

Minute Order - PL Motion to cancel POS - 12/03/15: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/30/15 Plaintiff, NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDEN LOAN TRUST 2006-2 Motion to Cancel/Pull National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-2's Proof of Service Against Theresa Lee Filed on August 26, 2015 ResID: 11428 *********************************************** TENTATIVE: DENY MOTION. THERE IS NO LEGAL AUTHORITY FOR THE COURT TO CANCEL THE PUBLIC RECORD CONSISTING OF THE FILED PROOF OF SERVICE. PLAINTIFF CAN DISMISS THE ERRONEOUSLY SERVED PARTY WITH SPECIFIC ID LIMITATIONS, AND GET SERVICE ON THE PROPER PARTY. ************************************************; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: DJIVRE, ALEXIS B; Cross Complainant; Attorney: DJIVRE, ALEXIS B

Case Management Conference

Minute Order- CMC 01/12/16: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Minute Order- CMC 01/12/16: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: granting joint Stipulation to dismiss Defendant, Theresa Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Stipulation - Comment: (Joint) to dismiss defendant, Theresa Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • Case Management Statement - Comment: Filed by Stephanie J. Boone, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • Accounting - Comment: Completed withdrawal of $30 from trust to One Touch Legal Services on 12/3/15.tl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion (Pre-Disposition) - Minute Order - PL Motion to cancel POS - 12/03/15: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/30/15 Plaintiff, NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDEN LOAN TRUST 2006-2 Motion to Cancel/Pull National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-2's Proof of Service Against Theresa Lee Filed on August 26, 2015 ResID: 11428 *********************************************** TENTATIVE: DENY MOTION. THERE IS NO LEGAL AUTHORITY FOR THE COURT TO CANCEL THE PUBLIC RECORD CONSISTING OF THE FILED PROOF OF SERVICE. PLAINTIFF CAN DISMISS THE ERRONEOUSLY SERVED PARTY WITH SPECIFIC ID LIMITATIONS, AND GET SERVICE ON THE PROPER PARTY. ************************************************; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: DJIVRE, ALEXIS B; Cross Complainant; Attorney: DJIVRE, ALEXIS B

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2015
  • Demurrer - Comment: to Cross-Complainant's Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • Notice of Hearing/Demurrer - Comment: Demurrer of Cross-Defendant National Collegiate Studen Loan Trust 2006-2 to Cross-Complainant's Cross-Complaint Hearing Date: 11/4/15 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Theresa Lee sub served 8/4/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Proof of Service by Mail - Comment: of Answer and Cross-Complaint, as to Attorney for Plaintiff.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Cross Complaint - Comment: of Theresa Lee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/29/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less