Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:15:04 (UTC).

NADLER VS RAMON

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 NADLER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RAMON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0942

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NADLER, RELDAN S.

HAYES-NADLER, JULI

Defendants

ALMENGOR, NICOLE

ALMENGOR, NICOLE AMANDA

RAMON, JOHNNY

RAMON, JOHNNY, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DESSY, FAWN KENNEDY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2015
  • Cause of Action: Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; Type: Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: NADLER, RELDAN S.; HAYES-NADLER, JULI; Awarded Against: RAMON, JOHNNY; ALMENGOR, NICOLE; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $1,600.00; Holdover Damages: $1,280.16; Attorney Fees: $300.00; Costs: $475.00; Other: $160.00; Total: $3,815.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: NADLER, RELDAN S.; HAYES-NADLER, JULI; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 8012 N. LAURELGLEN BLVD., #C, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93309; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: RAMON, JOHNNY; ALMENGOR, NICOLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: Returned via Attorney Messenger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Final Judgment/Unlawful Detainer - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer(s): Etienne, Linda S., Copelan, James B.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • Cause Of Action - Action Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; File Date: 09/15/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: and Worksheet for Default Judgment Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • Request for Court Judgment - Comment: as to Johnny Ramon aka Johnny Ramon III and Nicole Almengor aka Nicole Amanda Almengor

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Nicole Almengor aka Nicole Amanda Almengor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Johnny Ramon aka Johnny Ramon III.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to All unknown occupants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: NADLER, RELDAN S., HAYES-NADLER, JULI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 8012 N. LAURELGLEN BLVD. #C BAKERSFIELD, CA 93309

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less