This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:42:25 (UTC).

MUSTO VS MUSTO (E)

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 MUSTO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MUSTO E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L. and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1859

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MUSTO, KIMBERLY

Respondent

MUSTO, JONATHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SWANSON, JEREMY D

 

Court Documents

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 07/24/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 5/17/2018 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 05/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 04/10/17 PET S/S ATTY F/C PROP CNTRL; Parties Present Petitioner: MUSTO, KIMBERLY; Attorney: SWANSON, JEREMY D; Respondent: MUSTO, JONATHAN

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 07/24/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 5/17/2018 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: HRG 7/24/2018 DIV E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 05/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 04/10/17 PET S/S ATTY F/C PROP CNTRL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY MOTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: HRG 05/04/17 DIV E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300) - Comment: HRG 05/04/2017 DIV E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less