This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:27:18 (UTC).

MURILLO VS RUIZ

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 MURILLO filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against RUIZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5890

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MURILLO, JESUS

JESUS MURILLO AGENT FOR LOS PRIMOS MEAT MARKET LLC

Defendant

RUIZ, JOSE

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: return Paz Bin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: JESUS MURILLO AGENT FOR LOS PRIMOS MEAT MARKET LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 603 BROWN ST STE B BAKERSFIELD, CA 93305; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: RUIZ, JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: JOSE RUIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: JOSE RUIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: JESUS MURILLO AGENT FOR LOS PRIMOS MEAT MARKET LLC; Served: 10/10/201711:29 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 603 BROWN ST STE B, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93305

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less