This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 22:20:54 (UTC).

MURANO VS MURANO (B)

Case Summary

On 03/25/2015 MURANO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MURANO B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fielder, John L., Schuett, Stephen D., Stainfield, Bryan K., Cannon, Gloria, Horrigan, George R. and Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1920

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fielder, John L.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Cannon, Gloria

Horrigan, George R.

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MURANO, PATRICIA O

Respondent

MURANO, MARK C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Respondent Attorneys

FALK, GREGORY P

MARSHALL, MELLANIE S

Other Attorneys

DENATALE, THOMAS V

Attorney at KLEIN DENATALE ET AL LLP

Klein Denatale Goldner 4550 California Ave 2Fl

Bakersfield, CA 93309

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 03/11/2020: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 02/05/20 PET WAIVE RES FINAL DOD

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: JUDGMENT; RETURN VIA AMS

Court Trial

Court Trial 12/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: COURT TRIAL; Parties Present Petitioner: MURANO, PATRICIA O; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R; Respondent: MURANO, MARK C; Attorney: MARSHALL, MELLANIE S

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 10/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R; Respondent; Attorney: MARSHALL, MELLANIE S

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: FOAH RET'D TO G. HORRIGAN

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 09/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT FROM 3/5/18 4/10/18 5/2/18; Parties Present Petitioner: MURANO, PATRICIA O; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Court Trial

Court Trial 09/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/13/17 PET MOD C/V DAYCARE MINORS COUNSEL ACTIVITIES PICTURES 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 11/15/17, 1/17/18, 3/05/18 4/10/18; Parties Present Petitioner: MURANO, PATRICIA O; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw 08/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 07/11/18 NOM TO BE RELIEVED NO SERVICE ON MINOR'S COUNSEL

Family Centered Case Resolution

Request for Order - Petitioner 05/02/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 12/27/17 NOTICE OF HEARING FCCR CONT'D FROM 3/05/18 4/10/18

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 04/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Horrigan, George R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 12/27/17 NOTICE OF HEARING FCCR CONT'D FROM 3/05/18

Family Centered Case Resolution

Request for Order - Petitioner 03/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: 12/27/17 NOTICE OF HEARING FCCR CONT'D FROM 1/17/18; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 01/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/13/17 PET MOD C/V DAYCARE MINORS COUNSEL ACTIVITIES PICTURES 3 MINORS CONT 11/15/17; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R; Respondent; Attorney: FALK, GREGORY P

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 11/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/13/17 PET MOD C/V DAYCARE MINORS COUNSEL ACTIVITIES PICTURES 3 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: MURANO, PATRICIA O; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R; Respondent: MURANO, MARK C; Attorney: FALK, GREGORY P

Review

11/14/2016 MO - REVIEW CUSTODY, VISITATION: 11/14/16 HRG: DISSOMASTER: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET C/C C/V; Parties Present Petitioner: MURANO, PATRICIA O; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R; Respondent: MURANO, MARK C; Attorney: FALK, GREGORY P

Request for Order - Petitioner

7/25/16 MO - PETITIONER CUSTODY, VISITATION, FAMILY LAW STAY AWAY: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/C C/V FAMILY LAW STAY AWAY ORDER 3 MINORS CONT 03/21/16; Parties Present Petitioner: MURANO, PATRICIA O; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R; Respondent: MURANO, MARK C; Attorney: FALK, GREGORY P

Request for Order - Petitioner

05/04/16 MO PETITIONER CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION, FAMILY LAW STAY AWAY ORDERS: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET C/C C/V FAMILY LAW STAY AWAY ORDERS 3 MINORS 03/21/16; Parties Present Petitioner: MURANO, PATRICIA O; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R; Respondent: MURANO, MARK C; Attorney: FALK, GREGORY P

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 03/11/2020: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 02/05/20 PET WAIVE RES FINAL DOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: JUDGMENT; RETURN VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketMotion to be Relieved / Withdraw - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 6/11/19 NOM RO BE RELIEVED **SERVICE ISSUES**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: E-FILED: Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Judgment Type: Administrative Disposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial - Court Trial 12/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: COURT TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Comment: HRG 09/05/18

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY MOTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: PET C/C C/V FAMILY LAW STAY AWAY ORDERS 3 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: THOMAS V. DENATALE New Attorney: GEORGE R. HORRIGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • Docket805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for MURANO, PATRICIA O (PE-1). Received from MURANO, PATRICIA, check no(s) 133828. Receipt #831272 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.