Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/02/2021 at 14:05:03 (UTC).

MUNGER HORTIFRUT NORTH AMERICA, LLC VS DAN DRAKE ENTERPRISES, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 MUNGER HORTIFRUT NORTH AMERICA, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAN DRAKE ENTERPRISES, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0048

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUNGER HORTIFRUT NORTH AMERICA, LLC

Defendants

DAN DRAKE ENTERPRISES, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

JIM'S SUPPLY COMPANY, INC,. A CORPORATION

DAN DRAKE ENTERPRISES, LLC

JIM'S SUPPLY COMPANY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HAMAMJIAN, CHARLES P.

WOOLMAN, WILLIAM M

Defendant Attorneys

STEAD, CALVIN R

WERNER, JOSEPH A

HAGAN, CHRISTOPHER J

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 01/27/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT'D FROM 11/18/20

Demurrer

Motion to Strike 12/02/2020: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/19/2020 Defendant, DAN DRAKE ENTERPRISES, LLC Demurrer to First Amended Complaint

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 11/18/2020: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont'd from 8/5/2020

Ruling

Ruling 06/30/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proofs of Service; multiple errors throughout. Party served does not conform to the Complaint. Sub Service is missing the Declaration of Mailing. Please review.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/22/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: T/E 8 DAYS JURY FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Comment: J/T & FSC SET 7/11/22 9AM DEPT 11 T/E 8 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf - Comment: Jury Trial/Final Case Management Conference hearings are set on July 11, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. in Department 11. Mandatory Settlement Conference hearing is set on June 10, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. in Department 17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Ruling at CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 01/27/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT'D FROM 11/18/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Hrg: 1/27/21 @ 8:30 am in Dept. 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Dan Drake Enterprises Answer to First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Notice of Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Inability - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: Extension granted - Responsive Pleading shall be filed not later than 6/22/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Inability to Respond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Dan Drake Enterprises, LLC, a Limited Liability Company via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Jim's Supply Company, Inc. via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proofs of Service; multiple errors throughout. Party served does not conform to the Complaint. Sub Service is missing the Declaration of Mailing. Please review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/14/202011:11 AM; Served: 04/08/20202:11 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/22/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JIM'S SUPPLY CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MUNGER HORTIFRUT NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEAD, CALVIN R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WERNER, JOSEPH A