This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 06:12:46 (UTC).

MUNDS VS VU

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 MUNDS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against VU. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1187

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MUNDS, DARRELL

ESPINOZA, JAIME

Defendants

VU, MAU

BEVERLY HOME FURNISHINGS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN, BEN

Defendant Attorney

DODGIN, DUSTIN S

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 09/08/2021 Hearing Time: 9:15AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: Judge Barmann, Dept. 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Insufficient Filing Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Mau Vu AKA Larry Vu via personal service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Beverly Home Furnishings, Inc. via personal service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 06/02/20213:45 PM; Served: 06/02/20213:45 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 09/08/2021 Hearing Time: 9:15AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROTHMAN, BEN