Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:50:22 (UTC).

MULLER VS MULLER(E)

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 MULLER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MULLER E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L., Shayer, Steven, Compton, James L., Gill, Susan M., Fielder, John L., Foley, Therese M., Cannon, Gloria and Diesman, Kathleen O.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1657

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Shayer, Steven

Compton, James L.

Gill, Susan M.

Fielder, John L.

Foley, Therese M.

Cannon, Gloria

Diesman, Kathleen O.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MULLER, JOSEPH CHARLES

Respondent

MULLER, SUZANNE IRENE

Minors

COUNSEL, MINOR

COUNSEL, MINOR'S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A

Respondent Attorney

ETCHEVERRY-BARNES, PAIGE M

Minor Attorney

CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 10/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 03/22/16 PET MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 8/24/17; Parties Present Petitioner: MULLER, JOSEPH CHARLES; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent: MULLER, SUZANNE IRENE; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 08/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 03/22/16 PET MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 5/23/17 7/18/17; Parties Present Petitioner: MULLER, JOSEPH CHARLES; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent: MULLER, SUZANNE IRENE; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 07/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 03/22/16 PET MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 5/23/17; Parties Present Petitioner: MULLER, JOSEPH CHARLES; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent: MULLER, SUZANNE IRENE; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw 06/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 05/01/17 RES NOM TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 04/05/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET MOD C/C C/V 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 2/1/17; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Request for Order - Petitioner

08/10/16 MO - REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 6/28/16; Parties Present Petitioner: MULLER, JOSEPH CHARLES; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent: MULLER, SUZANNE IRENE; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Request for Order - Petitioner

05/09/16 MO - REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 4/27/16 (RE: APPOINTMENT OF MINORS COUNSEL); Parties Present Petitioner: MULLER, JOSEPH CHARLES; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 07/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: SET FROM 5/22/19 DIV E; Parties Present Petitioner: MULLER, JOSEPH CHARLES; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent: MULLER, SUZANNE IRENE

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 05/22/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/26/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 8/28/18 12/06/18 2/21/19; Parties Present Petitioner: MULLER, JOSEPH CHARLES; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent: MULLER, SUZANNE IRENE

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 02/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 7/26/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 8/28/18 12/06/18; Parties Present Petitioner: MULLER, JOSEPH CHARLES; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent: MULLER, SUZANNE IRENE

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 12/06/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/26/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 8/28/18; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 08/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/26/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR 2 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent: MULLER, SUZANNE IRENE; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Request for Order - Petitioner

12/13/16 MO - REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET MOD C/C C/V 2 MINORS CONT FROM 10/5/16 10/25/16; Parties Present Petitioner: MULLER, JOSEPH CHARLES; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 10/05/2016: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 8/10/16; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent: MULLER, SUZANNE IRENE; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Request for Order - Petitioner

04/27/16 MO - REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 2MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A

Request for Order - Respondent

RESP SET ASIDE DEFAULT: Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES SET ASIDE DEFAULT STMNT OF DEC **TO BE HEARD IN DIVISION E**; Parties Present Petitioner: MULLER, JOSEPH CHARLES; Respondent: MULLER, SUZANNE IRENE

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: SET FROM 5/22/19 CONTD FROM 8/28/19 11/13/19 1/16/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial - Court Trial 01/16/2020: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: SET FROM 5/22/19 CONTD FROM 8/28/19 11/13/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial - Court Trial 11/13/2019: Judicial Officer: Diesman, Kathleen O.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: SET FROM 5/22/19 CONTD FROM 8/28/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketReporter's Transcript - Comment: HRG: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketAppointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Comment: BAYLIE CHURCHMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial - Court Trial 08/28/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: SET FROM 5/22/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketTrial Brief - Comment: HRG 8/28/19 DIV E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketTrial Brief - Comment: HRG 8/28/19 DIV E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: MULLER, JOSEPH CHARLES; MULLER, SUZANNE IRENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 01/16/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNSEL, MINOR is a litigant