This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:47:02 (UTC).

MOSQUERA VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 MOSQUERA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Lampe, David R. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2488

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Lampe, David R.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOSQUERA, JUAN CARLOS

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OFTRANSPORTATION

STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOPCHYAN, ARUTYUN

Defendant Attorney

CORRAL, JESUS

 

Court Documents

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike 03/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 2/6/17, by Defendant. Motion to Strike. ResID: 23917.

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

6/15/17 MO: Motion to Compel: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 5/16/17, by Defendant. Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One. ResID: 24765. ********************************************* TENTATIVE: GRANT MOTION TO STRIKE OBJECTIONS TO ALL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, NOS. 17-19, AND 21-23. GRANT MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES NOS. 17-19, WITHOUT OBJECTIONS, AND RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES NOS. 21-23. GRANT SANCTIONS IN AMOUNT REQUESTED. **************************************************

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/02/17 Hearing Time: 08:00 AM Hearing Department/Division:4

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2018
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: T/E: 5 DAYS Jury requested by all parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Comment: J/T: 8/27/2018 T/E: 5 DAYS Jury requested by all parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: T/E 5 DAYS (D-4) FCMC 8/17/2018 TD 8/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Mail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: To continue trial and related dates.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Stipulation - Comment: Stipulation and Request to Continue Trial and Related Dates

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Notice - Comment: Defendant's Notice of Change of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - 6/15/17 MO: Motion to Compel: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 5/16/17, by Defendant. Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One. ResID: 24765. ********************************************* TENTATIVE: GRANT MOTION TO STRIKE OBJECTIONS TO ALL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, NOS. 17-19, AND 21-23. GRANT MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES NOS. 17-19, WITHOUT OBJECTIONS, AND RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES NOS. 21-23. GRANT SANCTIONS IN AMOUNT REQUESTED. **************************************************

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2017
  • Letter Received - Comment: Letter From: Department of Transportation Date of Letter: 1/11/17 Re: Motion to Strike off calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Notice of Change Name/Address - Comment: Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • First Amended Complaint - Comment: First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Notice of Motion - Comment: Defendant State's Notice of Motion to Strike Hearing Date: 1/18/17 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Points and Authorities - Comment: Defendant State's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/02/17 Hearing Time: 08:00 AM Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less