This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:34:42 (UTC).

MOSLEY ET AL VS BRYANT ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 MOSLEY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BRYANT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2363

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOSLEY, MARTIN L.

MOSLEY, CHERYL

Defendants

BRYANT, GERALD N.

JACOBS, TIMOTHY

BRYANT, DEBORAH A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORR, TIMOTHY L

Defendant Attorney

VAN SCIVER, KURT D

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 06/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CRC 3.1385 Finalization of settlement/dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 02/05/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CRC 3.1385 Finalization of settlement/dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 12/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: crc 3.1385 why this matter should not be dismissed cont 08/06/18

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 08/06/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Kurt Van Sciver Document: Stipulation & Orer Consolidating Pending Actions Fee of $435 (x3) required.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: CRC 3.1385 Finalization of settlement/dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice - As to Both BCV-17-102363 AND RCL-17-000260 - Entire Action - Returned via E-File

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Hrg: 10/3/19 @ 8:30 am in Dept.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 06/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CRC 3.1385 Finalization of settlement/dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketStatement - Comment: Hearing: June 6, 2019 - Joint Status Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 02/05/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CRC 3.1385 Finalization of settlement/dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketStatement - Comment: Hearing 2/5/2019 - Joint Status Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Continuance - Comment: Hearing: 2-5-19 - Notice of Continued Hearing on Order to Show Cause

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 12/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: crc 3.1385 why this matter should not be dismissed cont 08/06/18

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: consolidating pending actions BCV-17-102363 and RCL-17-000260

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Kurt Van Sciver Document: Stipulation & Orer Consolidating Pending Actions Fee of $435 (x3) required.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO TIMOTHY JACOBS, US MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO DEBORAH A BRYANT, US MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO GERALD N BRYANT, US MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA US MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/24/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/18/2017; Served: 10/18/2017; Served: 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less