Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:15:42 (UTC).

MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSE TRUST 2011-1 VS ETHRIDGE

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSE TRUST 2011-1 filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ETHRIDGE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0982

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSE TRUST 2011-1 BY U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS CO-TRUSTEE

MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSET TRUST 2011-1

Defendant

ETHRIDGE, BARBARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WECHSLER, GLENN H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSE TRUST 2011-1 BY U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS CO-TRUSTEE; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 210 DOUGLAS STREET, UNIT A, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93308; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against: ETHRIDGE, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: Returned via Enclosed envelope.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: As to Barbara Ethridge.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Barbara Ethridge.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to All unknown occupants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT AS TO BARBARA ETHRIDGE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 210 DOUGLAS STREET, UNIT A, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSE TRUST 2011-1 BY U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS CO-TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Complaint/Unlawful Detainer Action Based on CCP 1161A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less