This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 07:15:13 (UTC).

MORSE VS MORSE

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 MORSE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MORSE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foley, Therese M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1000

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foley, Therese M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MORSE, ADAM

Respondent

MORSE, LESLIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketProperty Declaration - Comment: 2ND AMENDED SEPERATE PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketProperty Declaration - Comment: 2ND AMENDED COMMUNITY PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: REINA L JACOBY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketProperty Declaration - Comment: AMENDED SEPERATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketProperty Declaration - Comment: AMENDED COMMUNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.