This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:56:45 (UTC).

MOROSA VS MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 MOROSA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0910

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOROSA, MONIQUE

Defendant

MARTINEZ, CEASAR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2015
  • Cause of Action: Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; Type: Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: MOROSA, MONIQUE; Awarded Against: MARTINEZ, CEASAR; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $950.00; Holdover Damages: $1,044.78; Costs: $475.00; Total: $2,469.78

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: MOROSA, MONIQUE; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 716 EL PRADO DR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: MARTINEZ, CEASAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Writ of Possession Returned Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Final Judgment/Unlawful Detainer - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer(s): Etienne, Linda S., Copelan, James B.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • Cause Of Action - Action Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; File Date: 09/30/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • Declaration for Default - Comment: Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: as to Ceasar Martinez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • Writ Returned and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: As to Ceasar Martinez.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Ceasar Martinez.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to All unknown occupants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MOROSA, MONIQUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 716 EL PRADO DR BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less