This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 06:40:27 (UTC).

MORENO VS MEIER

Case Summary

On 11/23/2015 MORENO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MEIER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Pritchard, Kenneth G. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0201

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORENO, BENJAMIN

Defendant

MEIER, SARAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOSTER, STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

MO - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(C): Judicial Officer(s): Pritchard, Kenneth G., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BOSTER, STEVEN

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: MORENO, BENJAMIN; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 141 W. Church Ave. Apt. G Ridgecrest, CA 93555; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against: MEIER, SARAH; Party: Names: MORENO, BENJAMIN; MEIER, SARAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Writ Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Writ of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution Possession or - Comment: Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Sarah Meier

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: unnamed occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: SARAH MEIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - MO - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(C): Judicial Officer(s): Pritchard, Kenneth G., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BOSTER, STEVEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • Amended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: MORENO, BENJAMIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.