Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 18:59:52 (UTC).

MORENO VS ABATE-A-WEED, AS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ORGANIZED UNDER THE LAWS OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 MORENO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ABATE-A-WEED, AS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ORGANIZED UNDER THE LAWS OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R., Chapin, Sidney P. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0451

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Chapin, Sidney P.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORENO, ANTHONY

Defendant

ABATE-A-WEED, AS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ORGANIZED UNDER THE LAWS OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETER, ARNOLD P

Defendant Attorney

GARBACZ, GREGORY ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Motion to Strike

DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STIKE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint filed by defendant

Ruling

RULING ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Strike

MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 8/27/15 Defendant, ABATE-A-WEED, INC. Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: PETER, ARNOLD P

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: t/e 5 days jury for both sides

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: j/t & f.c.m.c. set 10/3/16 9am dept 11 t/e 5 days jury for both sides

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • Demurrer First Amended Complaint - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 12/14/15 Defendant, Abate-A-Weed, Inc. Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ResID: 12808

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • Motion to Strike - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 12/14/15 Defendant, Abate-A-Weed, Inc. Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ResID: 12809

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • Letter Received - Comment: Letter From: Frank C. Olah Date of Letter: 1/22/16 Re: Vacating Demurrer and Motion to Strike set for 1/25/16

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2015
  • Points and Authorities - Comment: in Support of Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Notice of Hearing/Demurrer - Comment: Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint Hearing Date: 10/7/15 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: of Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Points and Authorities - Comment: in Support of Defendant's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Notice of Motion - Comment: Re: Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint Hearing Date: 10/7/15 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to ABATE-A-WEED, a California Corporation; substituted service on 7/30/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 10/29/2015 Hearing Date: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less