This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 23:44:37 (UTC).

MORELOS VS BECERRA

Case Summary

On 04/20/2015 MORELOS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BECERRA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Woodward, Cory J. and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5825

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Woodward, Cory J.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MORELOS, SALVADOR B

Respondent

BECERRA, MARIA R RODRIGUEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Woodward, Cory J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Returned Default to Salvador Morelos c/o Fast Action Services (by mail): does not comply with Kern County local rule 6.1; FL-170 missing named attachment; update date of signature on FL-165 #5; attach copy of proposed judgment to FL-165.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Docket805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for MORELOS, SALVADOR B (PE-1). Received from SALVADOR MORELOS, check no(s) 17168115336. Receipt #835262 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less