This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/25/2020 at 14:10:41 (UTC).

MORALES V. CABRERA

Case Summary

On 03/14/2012 MORALES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CABRERA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3116

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORALES, JUSTINIANO

Defendants

GARZA, MONIQUE

CABRERA, JUAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • DocketNP1511 - Comment: Department: AD Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: (N24A-LOCAL RULE 317.1(C) HEARING BEFORE TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY ALL PARTIES CASE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. WITHOUT PREJUDICE THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • Docket4191 Order to Show Cause (Local Rule 3.15.1(c)) - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: Reason on Calendar: Plaintiff to give legal reason why case should not be dismissed, plaintiff has failed to obtain default judgment or dismissal. Proof of Service: Both defendants were served by personal service on 3/22/12. Answer: no answer filed. Comments: If no appearance please dismiss case for lack of prosecution or if plaintiff appears continue to allow default judgment paperwork be filed or set osc re dismissal. Do not drop.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c); Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: Reason on Calendar: Plaintiff to give legal reason why case should not be dismissed, plaintiff has failed to obtain default judgment or dismissal. Proof of Service: Both defendants were served by personal service on 3/22/12. Answer: no answer filed. Comments: If no appearance please dismiss case for lack of prosecution or if plaintiff appears continue to allow default judgment paperwork be filed or set osc re dismissal. Do not drop.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED:SUMMONS;COMPLAINT;CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; WHO SERVED:MONIQUE GARZA HOW SERVED:PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED:03/22/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED:SUMMONS;COMPLAINT;CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET WHO SERVED:JUAN CABRERA HOW SERVED:PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED:03/22/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT MAILED TO MONIQUE GARZA RETURNED UNDELIVERED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT MAILED TO JUAN CABRERA RETURNED UNDELIVERED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT MAILED TO UNKNOWN TENANT RETURNED UNDELIVERED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2012
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE RETURNED TO PLAINTIFF BECAUSE THEY ARE LISTING BOTH DEFENDANTS ON ONE FORM (NEED TO USE SEPARATE PROOFS OF SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: POS: MISSISING DATE ON SIGNATURE, ONE POS MUST BE FILED FOR EACH DEFENDANT SEPERATELY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Jun 08, 2012 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ ROBERT S TAFOYA Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Jun 08, 2012 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ ROBERT S TAFOYA Judge of the Superior Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • Docket841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $240.00 for MORALES, JUSTINIANO (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 1162. Receipt #643836 for amount of $240.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 556

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less