This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 20:18:39 (UTC).

MORA VS MORA

Case Summary

On 03/23/2016 MORA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MORA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0085

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MORA, VICTOR

Respondent

MORA, YESENIA

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

05/13/16 MO: Request for Order-Petitioner: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: MORA, VICTOR

Ex Parte Hearing

**MO - Exparte Hearing: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: MORA, VICTOR; Respondent: MORA, YESENIA

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketMediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - 05/13/16 MO: Request for Order-Petitioner: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketInformed Consent for Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketMediation Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:45 AM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: PETITIONERS REQUEST TO MODIFY CHILD CUSTODY AND CHILD VISITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - **MO - Exparte Hearing: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • DocketEx Parte Application / Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: MORA, VICTOR; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.