This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:55:54 (UTC).

MORA ET AL VS ALBERTSONS, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/12/2017 MORA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALBERTSONS, LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D., Clark, Thomas S. and Bradshaw, J. Eric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2396

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Clark, Thomas S.

Bradshaw, J. Eric

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mora, William

Mora, Christine

Defendants

AM Wighton & Sons d.b.a. A&J Refrigeration

Albertsons LLC

ALBERTSONS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANDRADE, STEVEN R.

CONLEY, MATTHEW H.

Defendant Attorneys

GATES, JAMES W

SAROUKHANIOFF, NINOS

CALEO, PAUL

CAMERON, DUSTIN W.

THOMAS, SEANA B

 

Court Documents

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 03/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT 12/13/18 FURTHER DISCOVERY; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: CAMERON, DUSTIN W.; Defendant; Attorney: SAROUKHANIOFF, NINOS

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 12/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT 09/13/18 Further Discovery

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 09/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT 04/10/18 07/12/18 ** Jury Fees not posted by Plaintiff **

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 07/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT 04/10/18 ** Jury Fees not posted by Plaintiff **

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 04/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Service. Missing coversheet.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ANSWER. DUPLICATE FILING. ANSWER PREVIOUSLY FILED ON 11/22/17

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: SUMMONS ENVELOPE # 911805

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/25/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:10

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Stipulation & Order - Missing designated area for Judge's signature.

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

SDS Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Final Case Management Conference/Trial (N1):

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 06/10/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont'd from 3/14/19 and 05/14/19

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 05/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 3/14/19; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: CAMERON, DUSTIN W.; Defendant; Attorney: SAROUKHANIOFF, NINOS

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: T/E 7-10 DAYS Both Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Comment: jury: 08/24/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Comment: FCMC: 08/14/20 JURY: 08/24/20 T/E 7-10 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCourt Use Only - Pre-Cleared Ex Parte - Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Filing Party: Defendant Albertson's Ex Parte Application for leave to file Cross Complaint Contact- Damyta (510)691-7322 To Be E-filed Appearing Court Call

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Attn: Seana B. Thomas For: Assoication of Counsel: Duplicate Filing Received. Association of Counsel was filed 3/19/2020 at 4:07 pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney - Comment: Seana B. Thomas on behalf of the Defense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition - Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 03/13/2020: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filing Date: 3/12/20 Filing Party: Defendant-Albertsons LLC Application to continue trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketOpposition - Comment: to ExParte Motion to Continue Trial With Exhibits and POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Seana B. Thomas For: Notice of Association of Attorney Reason: Missing signature of Lead Attorney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Seana B. Thomas in Support of Ex Parte Application for an Order to Continue the Trial Date and all Related Dates

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint - Comment: Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ***GRANTED***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ANSWER. DUPLICATE FILING. ANSWER PREVIOUSLY FILED ON 11/22/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO AM WIGHTON & SONS DBA A&J REGRIGERATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: SUMMONS ENVELOPE # 911805

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/25/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/15/2018; Served: 11/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.