This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/04/2020 at 07:50:53 (UTC).

MOORE VS TURNER

Case Summary

On 05/13/2004 MOORE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TURNER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4392

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOORE, NANCY

Defendants

TURNER, MARGI

TURNER, CHARLES DAVID, Sr.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2004
  • Docket115 Pmt: Writs Issued GC 26828 - Comment: Amount of $7.00 for MOORE, NANCY (PL-1). Received from MOORE-ALLEN, check no(s) 731. Receipt #103774 for amount of $7.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2004
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2004
  • DocketFinal Judgment/Unlawful Detainer - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2004
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: BL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NANCY MOORE (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. CHARLES DAVID TURNER (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. MARGI TURNER (DE-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. STIPULATION OF PARTIES ENTERED INTO, BASED ON THAT STIPULATION THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT IS ENTERED: WRIT OF POSSESSION TO BE ISSUED IF PROPERTY NOT VACATED BY 06/30/04. TOTAL AMOUNT OWED WILL BE $4000.00 AND WILL BE PAID OFF AT $125.00 PER MONTH STARTING 08/05/04 AND ON THE 5TH DAY OF EVERY MONTH THEREAFTER. ZERO INTEREST IF PAYMENTS ARE TIMELY AND BALANCE IS PAID OFF. ELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):149B/1009, 149B/3191.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2004
  • Docket4151 Unlawful Detainer Trial - (N6a) - Comment: New Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2004
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Comment: UD TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2004
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default - Comment: DENIED AND CORRESPONDENCE RETURNED. ANSWER FILED ON 05/21/04.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2004
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT: COMPLAINT WHO: CHARLES DAVID TURNER SR. MARGI TURNER HOW: PERSONAL SERVICE/PROCESS SERVER WHEN: 05/15/04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2004
  • DocketSummons-Unlawful Detainer Returned - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2004
  • DocketNotice of Trial - Comment: New Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2004
  • DocketMemorandum to Set Court Trial Filed - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2004
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: UNLAWFUL DETAINER - CHARLES AND MARGIE TURNER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2004
  • DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Fees - Comment: NAME OF APPLICANT: CHARLES AND MARGIE TURNER JUDGE: GARY WITT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2004
  • DocketApplication for Waiver of Fee - Comment: REGARDING ANSWER FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2004
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2004
  • DocketSummons Issued - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2004
  • Docket841B Pmt: Unlawful Detainer <$10,000 (1/1/04) - Comment: Amount of $149.30 for MOORE, NANCY (PL-1). Received from NANCY MOORE, check no(s) 729735. Receipt #96256 for amount of $149.30.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2004
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 236

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less