This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 18:14:53 (UTC).

MOORE VS MOORE

Case Summary

On 03/22/2016 MOORE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MOORE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0096

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MOORE, PAUL A.

Respondent

MOORE, WENDY L.

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: MOORE, PAUL A.; MOORE, WENDY L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Judgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Comment: STATUS DATE 2/22/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Declaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Appearance Stipulation and Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Stipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: CNL LEGAL DOC PREP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • Response - Comment: to Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.